IL SB1148 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall establish reimbursement rates that build toward livable wages for front-line personnel in residential and day programs and service coordination agencies serving persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities under the Act, including, but not limited to, intermediate care for the developmentally disabled facilities, medically complex for the developmentally disabled facilities, community-integrated living arrangements, community day services, employment, and other residential and day programs for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities supported by State funds or funding under Title XIX of the federal Social Security Act. Provides that on or before July 1, 2019, the Department shall increase rates and reimbursements and on or before that date, direct support persons shall earn a base wage of not less than $5.25 per hour above the highest applicable federal, State, county, or municipal minimum wage, and on or before that date, other front-line personnel shall earn a commensurate wage. Provides that on or before July 1, 2021, the Department shall increase rates and reimbursements and on or before that date, direct support persons shall earn a base wage of not less than $6.75 per hour above the highest applicable federal, State, county, or municipal minimum Wage, and on or before July 1, 2021, other front-line personnel shall earn a commensurate wage. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MHDDAA-DEV DISABIL WORKER WAGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-04-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20170555.5New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-5.4kNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback