IL SB1143 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Increases the maximum amount of the credit for instructional materials and supplies from $250 for taxable years beginning prior to January 1, 2023 to $300 for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2023. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CREDIT-INSTRUCTIONAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-03-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-03-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-03-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-03-07 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2021 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 610 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |