IL SB1140 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that if a judicial candidate or candidate for State's Attorney has changed his or her name at any time after being admitted to practice law in Illinois and before the last day for filing the petition or certificate for that office, then the candidate's name on the petition or certificate must include a list of prior names and dates for each name change during that time period, and the petition or certificate must be accompanied by the candidate's affidavit stating the previous names and the date or dates each of those names was changed. Provides that failure to meet the requirements shall be grounds for denying certification of the candidate's name for the ballot or removing the candidate's name from the ballot. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECT CODE-ATTY NAME CHANGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-21HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-03-21HouseArrived in House
2019-03-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2019
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2019
2019-02-21SenateDo Pass Executive; 015-000-000
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10510-5.1Amended CodeCitation Text
10516-3Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-10.2Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-17Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback