IL SB1138 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Home Equity Assurance Act. Provides that the governing commission of a home equity assurance program that levied at least $1,000,000 in property taxes in levy year 2019 or 2020 may not levy any property tax in levy year 2021. Repeals the provisions on January 1, 2025. Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for levy year 2022, the aggregate extension base of a home equity assurance program that levied at least $1,000,000 in property taxes in levy year 2019 or 2020 under the Home Equity Assurance Act shall be the amount that the program's aggregate extension base for levy year 2021 would have been if the program had levied a property tax for levy year 2021. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOVT REVENUE RECAPTURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0311 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-007-000 |
2021-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-05-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-04-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 630 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |