IL SB1138 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that a public utility providing electric service to less than 800,000 customers may not charge non-residential customers a rate from June through September that is more than 10% higher than the rate charged from October through May. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-WINTER-SUMMER RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1138&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1138.htm |