IL SB1135 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Electricity Excise Tax Law. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 640 | 2-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |