IL SB1126 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Removes language providing that the county clerk shall furnish updated copies of computer tapes or computer discs containing voter registration information. Provides that a Board of Election Commissioners may appoint 3 judges of election to serve in lieu of the 5 judges of election to serve in a primary election. In provisions requiring the State Board of Elections to publish precinct-by-precinct vote totals on its website, provides that the vote totals shall be for offices and candidates that the State Board of Elections certifies the election results. Provides that the State Board of Elections shall provide written notice not less than 60 days (rather than 30 days) before an election to selected jurisdictions of its intent to conduct a test of the automatic tabulating equipment and program. Provides that within 15 days (rather than 5 days) of receipt of the State Board of Elections' written notice of intent to conduct a test, the selected jurisdictions shall forward a copy of all specimen ballots to the State Board of Elections. Changes the title of the Direct Recording Electronic Voting Systems Article to the Direct Recording Electronic Tabulators and Electronic Ballot Marking Devices Article. Changes references to "direct recording voting system" to "direct recording electronic tabulator" throughout the Article. Changes references to "marking device" to "electronic ballot marking device" throughout the Article. Changes references to "public measures" to "public questions" throughout the Act. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECT CODE-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-02-07SenateTo Subcommittee on Election Law
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10514-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text
10522-6Amended CodeCitation Text
10524B-2Amended CodeCitation Text
10524B-4Amended CodeCitation Text
10524B-6Amended CodeCitation Text
10524B-9Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-1Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-10Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-11Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-12Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-13Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-14Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-15Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-15.01Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-15.1Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-16Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-17Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-18Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-19Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-2Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-3Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-4Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-5Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-5.1Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-5.2Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-6Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-6.1Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-7Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-8Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-9Amended CodeCitation Text
10528-9Amended CodeCitation Text
1054-8Amended CodeCitation Text
1054-8.03Amended CodeCitation Text
1055-7Amended CodeCitation Text
1056-35Amended CodeCitation Text
105Art. 24C headingAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback