IL SB1122 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the purpose of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-STUDENT BOOKING STATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-05-08HouseArrived in House
2017-05-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-001-000
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConnaughay
2017-05-05SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-04-26SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11551Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback