IL SB1107 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Merges all Article 3 police officers' pension funds and Article 4 firefighters' pension funds into the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) on January 1, 2021. Creates a Transition Board, which is responsible for planning, overseeing, and administering the consolidation. Authorizes the Transition Board to undertake numerous activities necessary for the consolidation, including making arrangements for the transfer of assets and liabilities and for making recommendations to IMRF for an appropriate system of determining, administering, receiving, and enforcing the required municipal contributions to the Fund. Makes conforming and other changes. Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law (PTELL) of the Property Tax Code to exclude from the definition of "aggregate extension" special purpose extensions made for contributions to IMRF for benefits under the Downstate Police and Downstate Firefighter Articles. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately, except that certain changes to the Illinois Pension Code and the Property Tax Code take effect January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-DNST POL-FIRE-IMRF MERGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Government Accountability and Pensions
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steven M. Landek

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
3520018-185Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-101Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-101.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-101.2New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-102.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-103Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-103.9New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-105Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-108.2Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-108.3Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-110Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-110.7Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-125Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-125.1Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-128Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-134Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-135Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-141Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-141aNew CodeSee Bill Text
4053-141bNew CodeSee Bill Text
4054-101Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-101.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-101.2New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-102.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-103Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-105Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-105cAmended CodeCitation Text
4054-105dAmended CodeCitation Text
4054-106.5New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-108Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-118Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-118.1Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-121Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-124Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-128Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-130.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-130.3New CodeSee Bill Text
4054-134Amended CodeCitation Text
4057-175Amended CodeCitation Text
4057-175.1Amended CodeCitation Text
4057-199.5New CodeSee Bill Text
4057-199.6New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback