IL SB1090 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Interstate Mutual Emergency Aid Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ATTY GEN-ACCESSIBILITY VIOLATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2019-04-15HouseArrived in House
2019-04-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConchie
2019-04-12SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-04-05SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52351Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback