IL SB1085 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Educational Planning Services Consumer Protection Act to protect consumers who enter into agreements with educational planning service providers and to regulate educational planning service providers. Provides that it shall be unlawful for any person or entity to act as an educational planning service provider except as authorized by the Act. Prohibits an educational planning service provider from providing educational planning services to a consumer for a fee without a written contract signed and dated by both the consumer and the educational planning service provider; sets forth contract requirements. Prohibits an educational planning service provider from charging or receiving from a consumer any enrollment fee, set up fee, up-front fee of any kind, or maintenance fee, and provides that a consumer shall pay only for the educational planning services provided. Sets forth other requirements and prohibitions. Contains provisions concerning required disclosures, the cancellation of a contract and refunds, noncompliance, civil remedies and an injunction, notice, and rules. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act to provide that any person who violates the Educational Planning Services Consumer Protection Act commits an unlawful practice.
Title
EDUC PLAN SERVICES CONSUMER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0571 |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Consumer Protection Committee; 006-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villanueva |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |