IL SB1064 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Township Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the compensation to be paid to the road district treasurer and other township officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-04-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60165-20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback