IL SB1041 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-24 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Adriane Johnson
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-24 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Adriane Johnson
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts House Amendment No. 3 with the following changes. Provides that the Task Force on Infant and Maternal Mortality Among African Americans shall partner with Holistic Birth Collective to advise the Department of Healthcare and Family Services on the development of a Medicaid voucher program that is eligible for federal dollars to expand consumer choice for Black mothers that includes planned home birth services and in-home perinatal and postpartum care services provided by racially concordant nationally accredited certified professional midwives who are licensed and registered in Illinois. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services and the Department of Public Health are authorized to adopt rules to implement the new provisions. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services must apply for a State Plan amendment no later than December 31, 2022.
Title
DHFS-REPORT-HEALTHCHOICE IL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-24 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-11-28 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3, 4 - October 28, 2021 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3, 4 |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-10-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-10-28 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2021-10-28 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2021-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-10-28 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-10-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-10-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-10-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-10-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-10-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-10-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-10-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee; 008-004-000 |
2021-10-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-10-27 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2021-10-27 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-10-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-10-27 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2021-10-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Gillespie |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.01a | Amended Code | Citation Text |