IL SB1040 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning rates for inpatient services, requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to make adjustment payments to a hospital that reopens a previously closed hospital facility within 3 calendar years of the hospital facility's closure, if the previously closed hospital facility qualified for certain inpatient adjustment payments at the time of closure, until utilization data for the new facility is available for the Medicaid inpatient utilization rate calculation. Provides that a "closed hospital facility" shall include hospitals that have been terminated from participation in the medical assistance program. Provides that qualifying hospitals shall have the payment rate assigned to the previously closed hospital facility at the date of closure, until utilization data for the new facility is available for the Medicaid inpatient utilization rate calculation. In a provision requiring the Department to develop add-on payments that are consistent with Medicare outlier principles, provides that outlier fixed loss thresholds may be updated to control for excessive growth in outlier payments no more frequently than on an annual basis, but at least once every 4 years (rather than triennially). Requires the Department to update certain reimbursement components at least once every 4 years (rather than triennially). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-VENDOR PAYMENT CLAIMS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24SenateSent to the Governor
2021-10-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-10-28SenateSenate Concurs
2021-10-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2021-10-28Senate3/5 Vote Required
2021-10-27SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000
2021-10-27SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2021-10-27SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-10-27SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2021-10-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2021-10-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - October 27, 2021
2021-10-26SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2021-10-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2021-10-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-10-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-10-20HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-10-20HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-10-20HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-10-20HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000
2021-10-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-10-20HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2021-10-20HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Greg Harris
2021-10-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2021-10-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2021-10-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-10-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
2021-10-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-10-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-10-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-05-15HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-05-04HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-30HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Greg Harris
2021-04-30HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-04-30HouseArrived in House
2021-04-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2021-04-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2021-04-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Gillespie
2021-04-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-04-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Health; 015-000-000
2021-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
2021-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Health
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Health
2021-04-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ann Gillespie
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health
2021-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021
2021-03-25SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2021-03-17SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1040&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1040.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1040eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1040enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1040sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1040sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1040ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1040ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1040_04292021_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB1040_10262021_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB1040ham002_10282021_005000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback