IL SB1038 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the unlawful sale of public conveyance travel tickets to a minor.
Title
CRIM CD-CHILD ABDUCTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-21 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0160 |
2011-07-21 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-07-21 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2011-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 005-000-002 |
2011-05-12 | House | Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-05-12 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-04-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andr |
2011-04-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2011-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Collins |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 10-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |