IL SB0991 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Third Reading - Lost; 011-028-010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Third Reading - Lost; 011-028-010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Passenger Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
VEH CD-DRIVING IN LEFT LANE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Lost; 011-028-010 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Oberweis |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 25 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |