IL SB0984 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Agency Energy Efficiency Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE POLICE-CLASSIFICATIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-04HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bivins
2017-05-03SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-03-16SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Tim Bivins
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20201Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback