IL SB0983 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Limitations on Forced Arbitration Act. Defines terms and contains statements of findings, purpose, and policy. Places conditions limiting the use of forced arbitration agreements on entities doing business with the State. Creates a rebuttable presumption that specified contract terms relating to forced arbitration agreements are unconscionable. Prohibits arbitration agreements in specified situations. Provides that, with specified exceptions, appellate courts do not have jurisdiction to review a trial court's interlocutory order denying a motion to compel arbitration or otherwise concluding that an arbitration agreement is unenforceable or does not apply to a particular claim. Makes other changes, including a corresponding change in the Uniform Arbitration Act. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that a person may initiate on behalf of the State an action alleging violations of the Act to recover civil penalties on behalf of the State and to seek injunctive, declaratory, or other equitable relief that the State would itself be entitled to seek. Allows such a person a percentage of the recovery. Adds provisions governing: the State's opportunity to intervene and proceed with the action; discovery; prohibition of duplicative actions; settlement; limitations on State actions initiated by a private party; res judicata; relationship to forced arbitration; and severability.
Title
CONSUMER AND EMPLOYEE JUSTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
710 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 505 | 10e | New Code | See Bill Text |
815 | 505 | 2Z | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=983&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0983.htm |