IL SB0981 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Equal Pay Act of 2003. Prohibits an employer from: (i) screening job applicants based on their wage or salary history, (ii) requiring that an applicant's prior wages satisfy minimum or maximum criteria, and (iii) requesting or requiring as a condition of being interviewed or as a condition of continuing to be considered for an offer of employment that an applicant disclose prior wages or salary. Prohibits an employer from seeking the salary, including benefits or other compensation or salary history, of a job applicant from any current or former employer. Limits defenses. Provides for penalties and injunctive relief.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EQUAL PAY ACT-WAGE HISTORY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass Labor; 010-005-000
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82011210Amended CodeCitation Text
82011230Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback