IL SB0973 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0087
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that no later than December 31, 2018, and on December 31 of each year thereafter through December 31, 2023, the Department of Children and Family Services shall prepare and submit an annual report, covering the previous fiscal year, to the General Assembly regarding youth in care waiting for placements. Provides that the report shall include information on: (i) the number of youth in care who remained in emergency placements, including but not limited to shelters and emergency foster homes, for longer than 30 days, their genders and ages, their recommended placement type, and other specified data; (ii) the number of youth in care who remained in psychiatric hospitals beyond the time they were clinically ready for discharge or beyond medical necessity, whichever is sooner, their genders and ages, their recommended placement type, and other specified data; (iii) the number of youth in care who remained in a detention center or Department of Juvenile Justice facility solely because the Department cannot locate an appropriate placement for the youth, their genders and ages, their recommended placement type, and other specified data; (iv) a description of how the Department collected the information reported and any difficulties the Department had in collecting the information and whether there are concerns about the validity of the information; and (v) a description of any steps the Department is taking to reduce the length of time youth in care wait in psychiatric hospitals, emergency placements, detention centers, and Department of Juvenile Justice facilities for clinically appropriate placements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-REPORTS-YOUTH IN CARE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0087
2017-08-11SenateEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-11SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-14SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-16SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-05-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205052.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback