IL SB0965 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Autism and Co-Occurring Medical Conditions Awareness Act. Provides that the Act is repealed on January 1, 2027 (rather than August 12, 2021 (5 years after the Act's effective date)). Effective immediately.
Title
AUTISM/CONDITIONS AWARENESS
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Rep. Eva Dina Delgado [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] |
Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0305 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |