IL SB0960 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Real Estate License Act of 2000. Creates an education provider license to provides courses in pre-license, post-license, and continuing education subjects related to real estate transactions. Provides the requirements for an education provider license. Makes conforming changes throughout the Act. Creates an education provider instructor license and makes conforming changes throughout the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REAL ESTATE-EDUC PROVIDERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-01-24SenateRe-assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2254541-10Amended CodeCitation Text
22545430-10Amended CodeCitation Text
22545430-15Amended CodeCitation Text
22545430-20Amended CodeCitation Text
22545430-25Amended CodeCitation Text
22545430-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-70Amended CodeCitation Text
2254545-80Amended CodeCitation Text
225454Art. 30 headingAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback