IL SB0956 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that upon payment of an annual administrative fee not exceeding $100, during the first 3 calendar quarters an employer may pay its quarterly contributions due for wages in equal installments. Establishes a schedule for payment of the contributions. Provides for the accrual of interest. Authorizes the issuance of necessary rules. Provides that payment on a quarterly basis is not available for calendar years when there are outstanding bonds under the Illinois Unemployment Insurance Trust Fund Financing Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNEMPLOYMNT CONTRBUTE QUARTRLY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-28SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (LB)
2018-02-14SenateRe-assigned to Labor
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (LB)
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8204051400Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback