IL SB0955 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall establish reimbursement rates which build toward livable wages for front-line personnel in residential and day programs and service coordination agencies serving persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities, including, but not limited to, intermediate care facilities for persons with developmental disabilities, community integrated living arrangements, developmental training programs, employment, and other residential and day programs for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities supported by State funds or funding under Title XIX of the federal Social Security Act. Provides that the Department shall increase rates and reimbursements so that direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $15 per hour and so that other front-line personnel earn a commensurate wage. Defines "front-line personnel". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEV DISABLED-DSP-WAGES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-31HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-05-30HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-25HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 009-006-000
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-22HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-16HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-11HouseArrived in House
2017-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-020-000
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-002-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20170555.5New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-5.4iNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback