IL SB0950 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides for executive agencies, the Department of Central Management Services, and the Capital Development Board to enter into guaranteed energy savings contracts. Requires the agencies to enter into a request for proposals before entering into a guaranteed energy savings contracts; sets forth requirements for the request for proposals. Sets forth provisions concerning the evaluation of proposals. Requires guaranteed energy savings contracts to result in energy or operational cost savings within 20 years. Requires contractors to reimburse the State for any shortfall of guaranteed energy savings projected in the contract. Sets forth other requirements, and provides that certain State laws apply to any contracts entered into under the provisions. Provides that no provision shall be interpreted to require the implementation of energy conservation measures that conflict with respect to any property eligible for, nominated to, or entered on the National Register of Historic Places or the Illinois Register of Historic Places. Removes prior provisions allowing the chief procurement officer to promulgate rules for entering into energy conservation program contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCUREMENT-ENERGY SAVINGS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-01-30SenateTo Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
2018-01-30SenateRe-assigned to Executive
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050025-45Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback