IL SB0943 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Requires the State Board of Elections, beginning no later than September 1, 2017, to utilize data provided as part of its membership in the Electronic Registration Information Center in order to cross-reference the statewide voter registration database against databases of relevant personal information kept by designated government agencies, including, but not limited to, driver's license information, at least 6 times each calendar year, and requires the Board to share findings with election authorities. Provides that if a voter has a registered change of address under certain provisions but claims to live at the prior address and the election authority is unable to immediately confirm registration at the prior address, the voter shall be permitted to register to vote a regular ballot, provided that he or she meets the documentary requirements for same-day registration. Provides that if the election authority is unable to confirm the registration and the voter does not meet the requirements for same-day registration, the voter shall be issued a provisional ballot. Provides that no voter shall be disqualified for voting due to an error relating to an update of registration. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1A-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=943&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0943.htm |