IL SB0941 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Changes the definition of "special event retailer" to include the sale or offering of spirits by an educational, fraternal, political, civic, religious, or non-profit organization. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-SPECIAL EVENT RETAILERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0017 |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Effective Date June 30, 2017 |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 1-3.17.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |