IL SB0940 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Developmental Disability and Mental Disability Services Act. Provides for the transition to community-based services of persons over 18 years of age with developmental disabilities in the State who qualify for Medicaid Waiver services, who reside in intermediate care facilities for persons with developmental disabilities with 9 or more residents, and who affirmatively request to receive community-based services or placement in a community-based setting and persons with developmental disabilities in the State who qualify for Medicaid Waiver services, who reside in a family home, who are in need of community-based services or placement in a community-based setting, and who affirmatively request community-based services or placement in a community-based setting. Establishes a schedule for the transition to community-based services. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall oversee the transition of persons to receive community-based services or placement in a community-based setting. Provides that nothing in these provisions forces persons who do not want community-based services or placement to move, nor does it force providers to close beds or enter into downsizing agreements with the State against their will. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MENTAL DIS-COMMUNITY-BASED

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-02-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4058012-1New CodeSee Bill Text
4058012-10New CodeSee Bill Text
4058012-5New CodeSee Bill Text
40580Art. 12 headingNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback