IL SB0938 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consent by Minors to Medical Procedures Act. Provides that provisions concerning the giving of consent to the performance of procedures or services apply to the giving of consent to the performance of procedures or services by a physician licensed under the Medical Practice Act of 1987 (rather than a physician licensed to practice medicine and surgery or a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSENT TO MEDICAL CARE-MINORS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-11-28SenateSenate Concurs
2018-11-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
2018-11-28Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-11-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-11-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-11-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 29, 2018
2018-11-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-11-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-11-27House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-13HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2018-11-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-11-12HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-11-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-11-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4102100.5New CodeSee Bill Text
4102101Amended CodeCitation Text
4102101.5Amended CodeCitation Text
4102102Amended CodeCitation Text
4102103Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback