IL SB0932 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-13 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Joint Committee on Administrative Rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-13SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
2021-10-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 19, 2021
2021-10-13SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2021-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-21SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2021
2021-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
2021-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021
2021-03-25SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2021-03-17SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51005-90Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback