IL SB0931 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that the public agency that is the custodian or guardian of the minor shall file a written report with the court no later than 15 days after a minor in the agency's care remains: (1) in a shelter placement beyond 30 days; (2) in a psychiatric hospital past the time when the minor is clinically ready for discharge or beyond medical necessity for the minor's health; or (3) in a detention center or Department of Juvenile Justice facility solely because the public agency cannot find an appropriate placement for the minor. Provides that the report shall explain the steps the agency is taking to ensure the minor is placed appropriately, how the minor's needs are being met in the minor's shelter placement, and if a future placement has been identified by the Department, why the anticipated placement is appropriate for the needs of the minor and the anticipated placement date. Provides that if not contained in the agency's service plan, the agency's report shall specify if a minor is placed in a licensed child care facility under a corrective plan by the Department due to concerns impacting the minor's safety and well-being. Provides that the report shall explain the steps the Department is taking to ensure the safety and well-being of the minor and that the minor's needs are met in the facility. Defines "shelter placement."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-SHELTER PLACEMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-20SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054051-3Amended CodeCitation Text
7054052-28Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback