IL SB0928 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act. Provides that an owner who intends to convey any interest in property subject to assessments under this Act shall notify the board that the owner intends to convey the property. Provides that upon receiving such a notice from the owner, the board shall provide each person to whom an interest in the property is conveyed with written documentation detailing the assessment structure of the association. Provides that the written documentation must include the penalties for failure to pay the assessments required by the association. Provides that the written documentation shall provide space for both the owner and each person to whom the property is conveyed to indicate by signature or initial that the written documentation has been provided to and reviewed by the person to whom the property is conveyed. Provides that the board shall be provided with and keep a copy of the signed or initialed documentation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CICAA-NOTICE OF ASSESSMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bertino-Tarrant
2017-05-03SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7651601-37New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback