IL SB0927 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act. Provides that the board shall have the power, after notice and an opportunity to be heard, to (i) place a lien upon the owner's residence in the event the owner has amassed an unpaid assessment totaling $500 or more; and (ii) to begin foreclosure proceedings on property upon which a lien has attached once the owner has amassed an unpaid assessment of $1,000 or more. Provides that nothing in the new provisions prevents the board from levying and collecting fines. Makes a corresponding change in the Code of Civil Procedure.
Title
CICAA-BOARD POWERS:ASSESSMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 9-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 160 | 1-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=927&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0927.htm |