IL SB0910 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on November 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-08 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that when a county board creates or modifies the apportionment of districts in the county, each district shall also (i) provide racial minorities or language minorities with equal opportunity to participate in the political process and elect candidates of their choice; (ii) provide racial minorities or language minorities who constitute less than a voting-age majority of a district with an opportunity to substantially influence the outcome of an election; and (iii) shall not discriminate against or in favor of any political party or individual.
Title
CNTY BOARD APPORTIONMENT PLAN
Sponsors
Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] |
Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 033-022-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-003-000 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2017-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2017 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-047-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-05-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-05-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 030-020-000 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-002-001 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 2-3001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 2-3003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |