IL SB0904 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Creates an advisory council within the Department of Insurance to review and make recommendations to the Department regarding rules to be adopted by the Department concerning continuing education courses, course materials, curriculum, and credentials of instructors. Provides that the members shall be appointed by the Director of Insurance. Provides criteria for membership, length of terms, term limits, and quorum. Provides that a member of the advisory council or a designee of the Director shall be permitted access to any classroom or any educational offering while instruction is in progress to monitor the instruction for any class that has been submitted to the Department for continuing education credit under the provisions of the Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-CONT ED ADVISRY COUNCIL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-23HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-001-004
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-21HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-05-17HouseRe-assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-14HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee
2018-05-10HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 011-000-000
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Insurance
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155401.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback