IL SB0904 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Creates an advisory council within the Department of Insurance to review and make recommendations to the Department regarding rules to be adopted by the Department concerning continuing education courses, course materials, curriculum, and credentials of instructors. Provides that the members shall be appointed by the Director of Insurance. Provides criteria for membership, length of terms, term limits, and quorum. Provides that a member of the advisory council or a designee of the Director shall be permitted access to any classroom or any educational offering while instruction is in progress to monitor the instruction for any class that has been submitted to the Department for continuing education credit under the provisions of the Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-CONT ED ADVISRY COUNCIL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 011-000-000
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Insurance
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155401.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback