IL SB0902 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Pharmacy Practice Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Provides that all applicants and licensees shall provide a valid address and email address, which shall serve as the address and email address of record, and shall inform the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation of any change of address or email address through specified means. Provides for the licensure (rather than registration) of registered pharmacy technicians, registered certified pharmacy technicians, and pharmacists, and makes conforming changes. Removes provision allowing each member of the State Board of Pharmacy to receive a per diem payment in an amount determined from time to time by the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation for attendance at meetings of the Board and conducting other official business of the Board. Changes references to "Director" to references to "Secretary" or "Department" throughout the Act. Eliminates the position of deputy pharmacy coordinator. Makes changes in provisions concerning definitions, duties of the Department, inactive status, pharmacists in charge, nonresident pharmacy licenses, record retention, automated pharmacy systems, remote prescription processing, and discipline. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PHARMACY PRACTICE-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Righter
2017-05-03SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2258510Amended CodeCitation Text
2258511Amended CodeCitation Text
2258512Amended CodeCitation Text
2258513Amended CodeCitation Text
2258515Amended CodeCitation Text
2258516Amended CodeCitation Text
2258516aAmended CodeCitation Text
2258517Amended CodeCitation Text
2258517.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2258518Amended CodeCitation Text
2258519Amended CodeCitation Text
2258520Amended CodeCitation Text
2258522Amended CodeCitation Text
2258522bAmended CodeCitation Text
2258525.10Amended CodeCitation Text
2258525.15Amended CodeCitation Text
2258527Amended CodeCitation Text
2258528Amended CodeCitation Text
225853Amended CodeCitation Text
225853.5New CodeSee Bill Text
2258530Amended CodeCitation Text
2258530.5Amended CodeCitation Text
2258532Amended CodeCitation Text
2258533Amended CodeCitation Text
2258534Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.12Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.13Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.14Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.15Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.16Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.18Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.20New CodeSee Bill Text
2258535.21New CodeSee Bill Text
2258535.5Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.6Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.7Amended CodeCitation Text
2258535.8Amended CodeCitation Text
2258536Amended CodeCitation Text
225855.5Amended CodeCitation Text
225857Amended CodeCitation Text
225859Amended CodeCitation Text
225859.5Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.28Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.38New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback