IL SB0901 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Collection Agency Act. Allows the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation to require participation in a multi-state licensing system for licensing under the Act. Allows the multi-state licensing system to charge an administrative fee. Removes a requirement to file an annual trust account financial report. Requires applicants and licensees to file an email address of record and allows the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to send certain notices to the email address of record. Provides that members of the Collection Agency Licensing and Disciplinary Board shall have no liability in any action based upon any disciplinary proceeding or other activity performed in good faith as a member of the Board (rather than members of the Board shall be immune from suit in any action based upon disciplinary proceedings or other acts performed in good faith as members of the Board). Removes a requirement that the Department maintain a roster of all active licensees under the Act and all person whose licenses have been suspended, revoked, or denied renewal under the Act. Requires that exhibits in court proceedings under the Act shall be certified without cost. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COLLECTION AGENCY-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff
2017-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22542513.1Amended CodeCitation Text
22542513.2Amended CodeCitation Text
22542516Amended CodeCitation Text
22542517Amended CodeCitation Text
2254252Amended CodeCitation Text
2254252.5New CodeSee Bill Text
22542527Amended CodeCitation Text
22542530Amended CodeCitation Text
2254254.6New CodeSee Bill Text
2254255Amended CodeCitation Text
2254257Amended CodeCitation Text
2254258aAmended CodeCitation Text
2254258cAmended CodeCitation Text
2254259.22Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback