IL SB0896 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Provides for the forfeiture of benefits for any person who otherwise would receive a survivor benefit who is convicted of any felony relating to or arising out of or in connection with the service of the member from whom the benefit results. Provides that all participants entering service after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be deemed to have consented to that provision. Provides that the changes under the amendatory Act shall not impair any contract or vested right acquired by a survivor before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-FELONY FORFEITURE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40510-109Amended CodeCitation Text
40511-230Amended CodeCitation Text
40512-191Amended CodeCitation Text
40513-807Amended CodeCitation Text
40514-149Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-187Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-199Amended CodeCitation Text
40517-149.1Amended CodeCitation Text
40518-163Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-156Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-147Amended CodeCitation Text
4054-138Amended CodeCitation Text
4055-227Amended CodeCitation Text
4056-221Amended CodeCitation Text
4057-219Amended CodeCitation Text
4058-251Amended CodeCitation Text
4059-235Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback