IL SB0892 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services may release information received by the central repository to select representatives of the Department of Children and Family Services through the indirect online request process. Provides that access shall be established by the Prescription Monitoring Program Advisory Committee by rule.
Title
CONTROLLED SUB-INFO RELEASE
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. Tom Demmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 318 | Amended Code | Citation Text |