IL SB0889 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Jury Act. Provides that, except as otherwise specifically provided by statute, no person who is qualified and able to serve as a juror may be excluded from jury service in any court of this State on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, ancestry, age, sex, marital status, order of protection status, disability, military status, sexual orientation, pregnancy, or unfavorable discharge from military service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JURIES-UNLAWFUL DISCRIMINATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0228
2017-08-18SenateEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-18SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-26SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-24HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-24HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-16HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-001-001
2017-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-03-08SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7053052Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback