IL SB0888 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Illinois Community College Board.
Title
COMMUNITY COLL-NURSING DEGREE
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Tim Bivins [R] |
Sen. Steven Landek [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 007-004-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Postponed - Higher Education |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Re-assigned to Higher Education |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-assigned to Higher Education |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-assigned to Higher Education |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - Higher Education |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Higher Education |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 007-006-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 2-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |