IL SB0887 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that the Illinois Community College Board may collect a fee to cover the cost of processing and handling individual student-level data requests pursuant to an approved data sharing agreement. Renames the ICCB Instructional Development and Enhancement Applications Revolving Fund to the ICCB Research and Technology Fund. Provides that the Fund shall receive all moneys received from processing requests for individual student-level data, and that money from the Fund shall be used for costs associated with maintaining and updating individual student-level data systems. Amends the State Finance Act to make a conforming change. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ICCB-RESEARCH & TECH FUND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-050-000
2017-05-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-11HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Community College Access & Affordability Committee; 006-000-000
2017-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Community College Access & Affordability Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Community College Access & Affordability Committee
2017-05-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Community College Access & Affordability Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Higher Education; 008-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-02-16SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1108052-11.2New CodeSee Bill Text
1108052-16.09Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.652Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback