IL SB0882 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act. Provides that the association shall have one class of voting membership (instead of "one class of membership") unless the declaration, bylaws, or operating agreement provide otherwise. Makes a similar change in the Condominium Property Act. Further amends the Condominium Property Act. Deletes language providing that if the property contains 4 or more units, the owners may agree to sell the property by a vote of 75%. Provides instead that if the property contains at least 4 but not more than 6 units, a vote of 75% of the owners is required to sell the condominium property. Provides that if the property contains 7 or more units, a vote of 85% of the owners is required to sell the condominium property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONDO/CICAA-SALES; MEMBERSHIP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-001-001
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-16SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 008-000-001
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7651601-30Amended CodeCitation Text
76560515Amended CodeCitation Text
76560518Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback