IL SB0872 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities shall be prorated if the property is first used as a qualified residence by a veteran with a disability after January 1 of a taxable year. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-VETERANS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-11-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-11-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-11-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-11-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-11-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-11-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-11-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-11-08HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-11-07HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-07HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2017-11-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-11-07HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-11-07HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-11-07HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-11-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-11-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris
2017-11-02HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-11-02HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-06-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-11HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-22SenateDo Pass Revenue; 007-000-000
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-169Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback