IL SB0871 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes the following changes with respect to the homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities: (1) provides that the exemption amount shall not be deducted from the property's equalized assessed value, but shall be an abatement from the property's total property tax liability for the taxable year; (2) provides that, if the veteran is a recipient of the Congressional Medal of Honor or is a former prisoner of war, then the property is exempt from taxation; (3) provides that the veteran is not required to have qualified for or obtained the exemption before death if the veteran was killed in the line of duty and the death is found to be service-connected; (4) makes changes concerning reapplication; and (5) provides that, if the veteran has a service-connected disability of 70% or more and the property has an equalized assessed value of $100,000 or more, then the amount of the exemption is $5,000 (currently, the property is exempt). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-DISABLED VETERANS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-02-22SenateTo Subcommittee on Property Taxes
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-169Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback