IL SB0868 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Enrolled on November 8 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall offer to each applicant for issuance or renewal of a driver's license or identification card who is 16 years of age or older (rather than 18 years of age or older) the opportunity to have his or her name included in the First Person Consent organ and tissue donor registry. Amends the Illinois Anatomical Gift Act. Makes conforming changes. Provides that upon the death of a donor who is an unemancipated minor, the parent or guardian of the donor may amend or revoke the anatomical gift of the donor's body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ORGAN DONOR REGISTRY-AGE 16

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-08 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-07SenateSent to the Governor
2017-11-08SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-11-08SenateSenate Concurs
2017-11-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-11-08SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-11-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000
2017-11-08SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000
2017-11-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Revenue
2017-11-08SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Revenue
2017-11-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-11-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-11-08SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-11-08SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-11-08SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-11-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - November 8, 2017
2017-11-08SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-11-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-11-07House3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-11-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000
2017-11-07HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-11-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-11-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-01HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-10-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-10-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
2017-10-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-10-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-08-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-02-16SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-02-16SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-16SenateDo Pass Public Health; 009-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62556-117Amended CodeCitation Text
755503Amended CodeCitation Text
755505Amended CodeCitation Text
755505-20Amended CodeCitation Text
755505-43Amended CodeCitation Text
755505-47Amended CodeCitation Text
755505-5Amended CodeCitation Text
755505-7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=868&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0868.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0868eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0868enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0868ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0868ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0868_04262017_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0868_11072017_015000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0868ham002_11082017_015001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0868ham001_11082017_015000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback