IL SB0867 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-17)
Status: Passed on December 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-17)
Status: Passed on December 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Reduces the fee collected by the Secretary of State for the filing of articles of organization, applications for admission, and restated articles of organization from $500 to $39 and reduces those fees in connection with a limited liability company with ability to establish series from $750 to $59. Effective immediately.
Title
LLC REDUCE ARTICLES FILING FEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0571 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | Effective Date December 20, 2017 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-11-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-11-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-11-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-11-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-11-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 7, 2017 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-001 |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-05-25 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-05-24 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 180 | 50-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |