IL SB0866 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0084
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0084
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Act. Provides that the Department of Veterans Affairs shall provide informational resources and education to veterans returning from deployment regarding service animals for individuals with disabilities including, but not limited to, resources and education on service animals that guide people who are blind, pull a wheelchair, alert a person with hearing loss, protect a person having a seizure, assist a person with a traumatic brain injury, and calm a person with post-traumatic stress disorder during an anxiety attack or psychiatric episode.
Title
VETERANS-SERVICE ANIMALS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0084 |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000 |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-16 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Postponed - Veterans Affairs |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2805 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |