IL SB0865 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires a school district report card to include the total and per pupil normal cost amount the State contributed to the Teachers' Retirement System of the State of Illinois in the prior fiscal year for the district's employees, which shall be reported to the State Board of Education by the Teachers' Retirement System of the State of Illinois. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SCH DIST REPORT CARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0227 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date August 18, 2017 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-05-28 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 007-001-000 |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-17a | Amended Code | Citation Text |